Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 900 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5527 Week
» 7265 Month
» 134708 Year
» 1800084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3695/22321
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6358   07/08/1943
O4 6291   10/11/1945
O4 3600   17/01/1948
O4 63643   29/10/1949
O4 63772   25/10/1952
O4 63675   29/10/1955
O4 63749   23/02/1957