Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 634 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5105 Week
» 16151 Month
» 16151 Year
» 1681527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1136/22159
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6626   30/06/1934
O4 6268   14/11/1936
O4 6332   27/05/1939
O4 6227   10/01/1942
O4 6234   05/02/1944
O4 3618   30/08/1947
O4 63859   07/05/1949