Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 963 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5455 Week
» 30289 Month
» 64621 Year
» 1729997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3312/22147
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6208   15/01/1938
O4 6614   16/11/1940
O4 6629   05/09/1942
O4 6250   16/12/1944
O4 3798   10/05/1947
O4 63847   24/09/1949
O4 63862   07/06/1952
O4 63847   01/01/1955