Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 36 Online
» 727 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 727 Week
» 19628 Month
» 19628 Year
» 1685004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #5040/28286
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 6566   04/08/1945
O1 3670   29/11/1947
O1 3865   10/08/1950
O1 63854   22/11/1952
O1 63838   29/04/1955
O1 63571   14/09/1957