Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 257 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4603 Week
» 4603 Month
» 71465 Year
» 1736841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1698
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B19 423 SIR SAM FAY 18/08/1917
B19 427   18/11/1922
B19 5425 CITY OF MANCHESTER 06/02/1926
B7 5462   07/04/1928
B7 5461   08/08/1931