Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3524 Week
» 28358 Month
» 62690 Year
» 1728066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1848
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 1167 LLOYD GEORGE 09/1920
B19 423 SIR SAM FAY 28/10/1922
B19 5425 CITY OF MANCHESTER 16/08/1924
B19 5423 SIR SAM FAY 20/03/1926
B7 5078   29/09/1928
B7 5466   16/07/1932