Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18001 Week
» 71017 Month
» 190544 Year
» 3217397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1849
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
13 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B3 |
1168 |
LORD STUART OF WORTLEY |
10/1920 |
B3 |
1167 |
LLOYD GEORGE |
26/08/1922 |
B19 |
5423 |
SIR SAM FAY |
26/07/1924 |
B3 |
6165 |
VALOUR |
04/06/1927 |
B7 |
5480 |
|
23/04/1932 |
B7 |
5459 |
|
20/01/1934 |
B7 |
5472 |
|
12/10/1935 |
B7 |
5036 |
|
24/04/1937 |
|