Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 37 Online
» 4266 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18309 Week
» 83263 Month
» 285927 Year
» 3312780 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #77
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
13 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B7 |
465 |
|
08/1921 |
B19 |
5423 |
SIR SAM FAY |
05/05/1928 |
B8 |
5004 |
GLENALMOND |
16/07/1932 |
B7 |
5073 |
|
08/12/1934 |
B8 |
5279 |
EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM |
15/08/1936 |
B7 |
5034 |
|
10/12/1938 |
B7 |
5464 |
|
26/10/1940 |
|