Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 852 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5479 Week
» 7217 Month
» 134660 Year
» 1800036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1922
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 37   10/1921
B7 5465   10/12/1927
B7 5467   30/05/1931
B7 5464   04/03/1933
B19 5423 SIR SAM FAY 29/12/1934
B7 5078   04/02/1939
B7 5469   11/01/1941