Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 278 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4997 Week
» 16142 Month
» 115927 Year
» 1781303 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3017
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5467   06/11/1937
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 24/06/1939
B19 5423 SIR SAM FAY 21/12/1940
B7 5078   12/06/1943
B7 5459   21/04/1945
B7 1370   17/01/1948