Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 278 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4997 Week
» 16142 Month
» 115927 Year
» 1781303 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #579
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5469   12/12/1931
B19 5424 CITY OF LINCOLN 11/11/1933
B3 6169 LORD FARINGDON 13/06/1936
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 25/06/1938