Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 146 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1215 Week
» 1215 Month
» 68077 Year
» 1733453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #784
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5470   25/08/1934
B19 5424 CITY OF LINCOLN 30/05/1936
B7 5031   29/01/1938
B7 5072   28/09/1940
B7 5473   29/05/1943