Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 892 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5519 Week
» 7257 Month
» 134700 Year
» 1800076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1845
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 1164 EARL BEATTY 06/1920
B3 1168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 29/07/1922
B7 5461   10/07/1926
B7 5481   07/11/1931
B7 5468   22/04/1933
B19 5425 CITY OF MANCHESTER 12/05/1934
B7 5480   14/03/1936
B19 5424 CITY OF LINCOLN 08/01/1938