Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 105 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1174 Week
» 1174 Month
» 68036 Year
» 1733412 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3005
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5476   22/06/1935
B7 5036   30/11/1935
B3 6165 VALOUR 08/05/1937
B7 5465   29/10/1938
B7 5033   18/11/1939
B7 5461   04/07/1942
B19 5424 CITY OF LINCOLN 20/05/1944
B8 5443   12/01/1946