Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 121 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2286 Week
» 2286 Month
» 69148 Year
» 1734524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1744
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B19 426 CITY OF CHESTER 22/06/1918
B19 428 CITY OF LIVERPOOL 26/05/1923
B19 5425 CITY OF MANCHESTER 20/08/1927
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 10/10/1931