Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 988 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5480 Week
» 30314 Month
» 64646 Year
» 1730022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #539
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5462   11/07/1931
B7 5463   16/09/1933
B8 5444   17/08/1935
B8 5443   22/01/1938
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 08/06/1940
B19 5425 CITY OF MANCHESTER 13/02/1943