Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1013 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5505 Week
» 30339 Month
» 64671 Year
» 1730047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1928
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 462   11/1921
B7 5464   28/07/1928
B7 5034   06/12/1930
B19 5426 CITY OF CHESTER 03/12/1932
B7 5466   26/05/1934
B7 5470   09/05/1936
B19 5428 CITY OF LIVERPOOL 02/04/1938