Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 99 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 28351 Month
» 62683 Year
» 1728059 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #274
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 471   06/1922
B7 5035   29/11/1924
B7 5483   20/12/1930
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 11/03/1933
B19 5426 CITY OF CHESTER 21/04/1934
B8 5280   25/01/1936