Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 341 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 15118 Month
» 142561 Year
» 1807937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3001
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B19 5427   02/03/1935
B7 5466   04/04/1936
B3 6169 LORD FARINGDON 05/03/1938
B7 5463   27/01/1940
B7 5471   26/09/1942