Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 314 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1155 Week
» 15091 Month
» 142534 Year
» 1807910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3021
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5073   19/03/1938
B7 5036   25/05/1940
B7 5468   15/08/1942
B19 5427   26/08/1944
B7 1386   22/03/1947