Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 22 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 863 Week
» 14799 Month
» 142242 Year
» 1807618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3002
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 16/03/1935
B7 5034   05/09/1936
B7 5072   17/12/1938
B8 5279 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM 09/11/1940
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 10/10/1942
B7 5468   05/08/1944
B19 1492   14/12/1946