Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 598 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1506 Week
» 12651 Month
» 112436 Year
» 1777812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1935
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 35   08/1922
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 31/10/1925
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 06/10/1928
B3 6169 LORD FARINGDON 10/05/1930
B19 5428 CITY OF LIVERPOOL 30/07/1932