Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 568 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1476 Week
» 12621 Month
» 112406 Year
» 1777782 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #763
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5477   14/07/1934
B7 5476   23/11/1935
B7 5078   03/07/1937
B8 5280   06/05/1939
B19 5428 CITY OF LIVERPOOL 15/11/1941
B7 5484   27/11/1943
B7 5482   27/04/1946