Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2284 Week
» 2284 Month
» 69146 Year
» 1734522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #45
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5471   18/11/1933
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 29/08/1936
B8 5279 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM 27/08/1938
B7 5477   03/05/1941
B19 5428 CITY OF LIVERPOOL 30/10/1943