Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 988 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5480 Week
» 30314 Month
» 64646 Year
» 1730022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7505
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 481   06/1921
O2 483   07/1921
O3 3474   01/12/1928
O3 3459   13/05/1932
O3 3463   06/12/1939
O3 3464   18/04/1942