Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 926 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 3195 Week
» 22096 Month
» 22096 Year
» 1687472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7716
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O3 3466   10/05/1924
O3 3467   27/06/1929
O3 3463   02/06/1934
O2 3497   17/10/1942