Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 334 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5053 Week
» 16198 Month
» 115983 Year
» 1781359 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #21027
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 2
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O2 63925   05/07/1951
O2 63987   15/02/1954
O2 63974   08/05/1956
O2 63973   18/08/1958
O2 63927   24/11/1961