Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 269 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4988 Week
» 16133 Month
» 115918 Year
» 1781294 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28577
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61043   26/02/1952
B1 61285   23/01/1954
B1 61362   13/01/1956
B1 61360   04/07/1958
O2 63925   20/12/1960