Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 645 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6176 Week
» 31010 Month
» 65342 Year
» 1730718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1846
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 1165 VALOUR 07/1920
B3 6169 LORD FARINGDON 27/06/1925
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 15/11/1930
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 27/02/1932
B7 5470   08/04/1933
B8 5442   13/10/1934
B7 5032   16/05/1936
B7 5459   04/09/1937