Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #242
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 479   03/11/1923
B8 5279 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM 01/03/1930
B7 5477   29/10/1932
B8 5445   28/07/1934
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 26/12/1936
B3 6169 LORD FARINGDON 18/11/1939