Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 397 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4889 Week
» 29723 Month
» 64055 Year
» 1729431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #267
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 469   04/1922
B7 5468   01/09/1928
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 31/12/1931
B7 5458   04/02/1933
B7 5072   16/05/1936
B7 5032   31/07/1937
B7 5462   25/03/1939
B7 5465   01/03/1941