Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 292 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5011 Week
» 16156 Month
» 115941 Year
» 1781317 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #51
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 10/02/1934
B7 5461   25/05/1935
B7 5479   09/01/1937
B7 5481   26/11/1938
B7 5460   02/01/1943
B7 5035   22/01/1944
B7 5461   23/02/1946