Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 336 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 15113 Month
» 142556 Year
» 1807932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #59
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 477   22/09/1923
B7 5474   30/03/1929
B7 5465   17/06/1933
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 13/04/1935
B7 5473   11/12/1936
B7 5476   17/12/1938
B7 5479   10/08/1940