Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 99 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 28351 Month
» 62683 Year
» 1728059 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #244
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 480   24/11/1923
B7 5031   09/08/1930
B7 5484   03/09/1932
B3 6164 EARL BEATTY 14/11/1936
B7 5484   09/04/1938
B7 5482   23/12/1939
B7 5036   09/05/1942