Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 274 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4620 Week
» 4620 Month
» 71482 Year
» 1736858 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #631
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B8 280   01/1915
B8 4 GLENALMOND 02/09/1922
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 11/11/1933
B7 5465   02/03/1935
B7 5461   05/12/1936
B3 6165 VALOUR 15/10/1938
B7 5466   06/07/1940
B7 5037   07/03/1942
B7 5032   25/03/1944
B7 5464   22/06/1946