Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 152 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2317 Week
» 2317 Month
» 69179 Year
» 1734555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3003
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5467   30/03/1935
B8 5442   25/04/1936
B8 5444   08/01/1938
B3 6165 VALOUR 15/06/1940
B7 5462   15/08/1942
B7 5038   20/01/1945
B7 1373   31/05/1947