Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 614 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1522 Week
» 12667 Month
» 112452 Year
» 1777828 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1847
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 1166 EARL HAIG 08/1920
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 05/07/1924
B7 5467   30/06/1926
B7 5463   04/07/1931
B7 5469   07/10/1933