Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 640 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1548 Week
» 12693 Month
» 112478 Year
» 1777854 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1932
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 32   07/1922
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 27/06/1931
B7 5481   08/04/1933
B7 5072   13/10/1934
B7 5484   18/07/1936
B7 5469   30/04/1938
B3 6166 EARL HAIG 04/11/1939
B7 5474   24/04/1943