Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 598 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1506 Week
» 12651 Month
» 112436 Year
» 1777812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #69
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 73   06/1921
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 30/07/1927
B7 5478   20/04/1929
B7 5073   17/06/1933
B7 5037   12/01/1935
B7 5464   25/01/1936