Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 470 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5457 Week
» 13572 Month
» 141015 Year
» 1806391 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #81
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 21/04/1934
B7 5467   04/04/1936
B7 5480   04/12/1937
B8 5443   18/05/1940
B7 5458   28/11/1942
B7 5474   06/01/1945
B7 1365   26/04/1947