Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 414 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5401 Week
» 13516 Month
» 140959 Year
» 1806335 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #300
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 474   08/1922
B8 5443   14/09/1929
B7 5480   06/01/1934
B3 6167 LLOYD GEORGE 28/03/1936
B7 5463   04/06/1938