Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 507 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5494 Week
» 13609 Month
» 141052 Year
» 1806428 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #355
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5483   02/02/1924
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 28/03/1931
B7 5034   05/11/1932
B7 5481   06/10/1934