Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 607 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6138 Week
» 30972 Month
» 65304 Year
» 1730680 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #65
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 72   05/1921
B7 5463   28/01/1928
B7 5460   24/10/1931
B7 5461   02/09/1933
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 01/06/1935
B7 5465   31/10/1936