Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 406 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5393 Week
» 13508 Month
» 140951 Year
» 1806327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3014
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 29/08/1936
B7 5479   17/09/1938
B8 5004 GLENALMOND 07/09/1940
B7 5033   11/04/1942
B7 5461   06/05/1944
B8 5004 GLENALMOND 08/06/1946