Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 71 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5602 Week
» 30436 Month
» 64768 Year
» 1730144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3022
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B3 6168 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 06/08/1938
B8 5444   20/04/1940
B7 5465   24/04/1943
B7 5073   25/11/1944
B7 1388   22/11/1947