Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 269 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4988 Week
» 16133 Month
» 115918 Year
» 1781294 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1931
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 31   07/1922
B7 5464   22/11/1930
B7 5072   01/04/1933
B7 5032   10/11/1934
B7 5033   27/06/1936