Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 55 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5586 Week
» 30420 Month
» 64752 Year
» 1730128 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #86
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B8 5439 SUTTON NELTHORPE 28/04/1934
B7 5035   07/03/1936
B7 5471   08/01/1938
B7 5460   24/02/1940
B7 5072   20/03/1943