Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 55 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4547 Week
» 29381 Month
» 63713 Year
» 1729089 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3011
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5481   04/07/1936
B8 5442   18/12/1937
B7 5073   30/03/1940
B8 5444   20/02/1943
B7 5036   24/11/1945