Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 251 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1092 Week
» 15028 Month
» 142471 Year
» 1807847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #73
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 78   07/1921
B7 5036   30/10/1926
B7 5466   02/03/1929
B7 5473   04/10/1930
B7 5483   04/02/1933