Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 10 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1920 Week
» 2859 Month
» 206349 Year
» 1871725 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #583
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B8 5440   04/11/1933
B7 5464   19/06/1937
B7 5078   23/11/1940
B8 5440   27/11/1943
B7 5470   24/11/1945